MN HF2732 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 21-1)
Status: Introduced on March 27 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-03 - Author added Nelson, N.
Pending: House Health and Human Services Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Public assistance and child care assistance program fraud prevention provided, theft offense penalties established, early learning scholarship eligibility modified, report required, and money appropriated.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public assistance and child care assistance program fraud prevention provided, theft offense penalties established, early learning scholarship eligibility modified, report required, and money appropriated.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-03HouseAuthor added Nelson, N.
2019-04-01HouseAuthor added West
2019-03-28HouseAuthor added Kresha
2019-03-27HouseReferred by Chair to Health and Human Services Finance Division
2019-03-27HouseIntroduction and first reading, referred to Ways and Means

Minnesota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback