MN HF2724 | 2013-2014 | 88th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 2 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-13 - Laid on table
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 2 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-13 - Laid on table
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Agency rulemaking regulated.
Title
Agency rulemaking regulated.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-05-01 - House - House: Passage, as amended (Y: 73 N: 55 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-01 - House - House: Amendment (Y: 56 N: 72 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-05-01 - House - House: Amendment (Y: 56 N: 72 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-05-01 - House - House: Amendment (Y: 58 N: 70 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-05-01 - House - House: Amendment (Y: 56 N: 72 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-05-01 - House - House: Amendment (Y: 60 N: 69 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-05-01 - House - House: Amendment (Y: 59 N: 70 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-05-01 - House - House: Amendment (Y: 104 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-01 - House - House: Amendment (Y: 56 N: 72 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-05-01 - House - House: Amendment (Y: 56 N: 72 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-05-01 - House - House: Amendment (Y: 58 N: 70 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-05-01 - House - House: Amendment (Y: 56 N: 72 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-05-01 - House - House: Amendment (Y: 60 N: 69 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-05-01 - House - House: Amendment (Y: 59 N: 70 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-05-01 - House - House: Amendment (Y: 104 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-13 | Senate | Laid on table |
2014-05-13 | Senate | Amended |
2014-05-13 | Senate | Taken from table |
2014-05-13 | Senate | Laid on table |
2014-05-13 | Senate | Special Order: Amended |
2014-05-05 | Senate | Second reading |
2014-05-05 | Senate | Comm report: Rule 45-amend, subst. General Orders SF2467 |
2014-05-02 | Senate | Referred to Rules and Administration for comparison with SF2467 |
2014-05-02 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
2014-05-02 | Senate | Received from House |
2014-05-01 | House | Bill was passed as amended vote: 73-55 |
2014-05-01 | House | Third reading as amended |
2014-05-01 | House | Amended |
2014-04-29 | House | House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Thursday, May 1, 2014 |
2014-04-01 | House | Second reading |
2014-04-01 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended |
2014-03-06 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Government Operations |