MN HF2718 | 2023-2024 | 93rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-3)
Status: Introduced on March 8 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-30 - Author stricken Harder
Pending: House Agriculture Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 8 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-30 - Author stricken Harder
Pending: House Agriculture Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Grain indemnity account established, and money appropriated.
Title
Grain indemnity account established, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-30 | House | Author stricken Harder |
2023-03-27 | House | Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Agriculture Finance and Policy |
2023-03-20 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Judiciary Finance and Civil Law |
2023-03-13 | House | Author added Sencer-Mura |
2023-03-09 | House | Author added Harder |
2023-03-08 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Agriculture Finance and Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF2218 (Similar To) 2023-03-27 - Comm report: To pass and re-referred to Finance