MN HF2707 | 2023-2024 | 93rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on March 8 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-05-19 - Author added Reyer
Pending: House Capital Investment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 8 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-05-19 - Author added Reyer
Pending: House Capital Investment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
St. Paul; Ethiopian Community Center funding provided, and money appropriated.
Title
St. Paul; Ethiopian Community Center funding provided, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
Rep. Dave Pinto [D] | Rep. Kaela Berg [D] | Rep. Brad Tabke [D] | Rep. Sydney Jordan [D] |
Rep. Peter Fischer [D] | Rep. Steve Elkins [D] | Rep. Sandra Feist [D] | Rep. Liz Reyer [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-19 | House | Author added Reyer |
2023-05-08 | House | Authors added Elkins and Feist |
2023-05-02 | House | Author added Fischer |
2023-05-01 | House | Authors added Tabke; Jordan |
2023-04-27 | House | Author added Berg |
2023-03-08 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Capital Investment |
Same As/Similar To
SF3273 (Similar To) 2024-02-12 - Author added Mitchell