MN HF2707 | 2009-2010 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-12 - House: House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-12 - House: House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Juvenile delinquency provisions modified to include stays of adjudication of delinquency, and juvenile delinquency continuance period duration extended.
Title
Juvenile delinquency provisions modified to include stays of adjudication of delinquency, and juvenile delinquency continuance period duration extended.
Sponsors
Rep. Joe Mullery [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-12 | House: House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day | |
2010-03-17 | House: Second reading | |
2010-03-17 | House: Committee report, to pass as amended | |
2010-03-11 | House: Committee report, to pass as amended and re-refer to Public Safety Policy and Oversight | |
2010-03-08 | House: Motion to recall and re-refer, motion prevailed Civil Justice | |
2010-02-04 | House: Introduction and first reading, referred to Public Safety Policy and Oversight |