MN HF2703 | 2023-2024 | 93rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on March 8 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-19 - Author added Virnig
Pending: House Education Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 8 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-19 - Author added Virnig
Pending: House Education Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Robotics programs grants authorized, report required, and money appropriated.
Title
Robotics programs grants authorized, report required, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-19 | House | Author added Virnig |
2023-03-09 | House | Author added Huot |
2023-03-08 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Education Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF1359 (Similar To) 2023-02-08 - Referred to Education Finance