MN HF2682 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 27 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-27 - Secretary of State Chapter 104
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Outdoor heritage fund funding provided, money appropriated for Medal of Honor memorial, and previous appropriations from legacy funds extended and modified.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Outdoor heritage fund funding provided, money appropriated for Medal of Honor memorial, and previous appropriations from legacy funds extended and modified.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-05-17 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-27 Secretary of State Chapter 104
2020-05-27 Governor's action Approval
2020-05-27 Secretary of State, Filed
2020-05-27 Governor approval
2020-05-18 Presented to Governor
2020-05-17SenateThird reading Passed
2020-05-17SenateSpecial Order
2020-05-17SenateTaken from table
2020-05-16SenateLaid on table
2020-05-16SenateSecond reading
2020-05-16SenateTaken from table
2020-05-15SenateLaid on table
2020-05-15SenateIntroduction and first reading
2020-05-15SenateReceived from House
2020-05-15HouseBill was passed vote: 110-21
2020-05-15HouseThird reading
2020-05-13HouseHouse rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Friday, May 15, 2020
2020-05-12HouseSecond reading
2020-05-12HouseCommittee report, to adopt as amended
2019-05-18HouseSecond reading
2019-05-18HouseCommittee report, to adopt as amended
2019-03-27HouseDivision action, return to Ways and Means
2019-03-25HouseReferred by Chair to Legacy Finance Division
2019-03-25HouseIntroduction and first reading, referred to Ways and Means

Same As/Similar To

SF2732 (Similar To) 2020-05-17 - HF substituted HF2682

Minnesota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback