MN HF2657 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 25-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-16 - Author added Moller
Pending: House Education Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-16 - Author added Moller
Pending: House Education Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
School district special education services fully funded, and money appropriated.
Title
School district special education services fully funded, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-16 | House | Author added Moller |
2022-03-31 | House | Author added Youakim |
2022-03-30 | House | Author added Lee |
2022-03-28 | House | Author added Freiberg |
2022-03-24 | House | Authors added Gomez and Noor |
2022-03-23 | House | Author added Bierman |
2022-03-17 | House | Authors added Acomb and Boldon |
2022-03-14 | House | Authors added Greenman, Hornstein |
2022-03-10 | House | Author added Long |
2022-02-28 | House | Author added Lippert |
2022-02-21 | House | Author added Fischer |
2022-02-17 | House | Author added Vang |
2022-02-10 | House | Authors added Olson, L.; Feist |
2022-02-01 | House | Authors added Stephenson, Bahner, Howard, Her, Jordan, Wazlawik, Christensen |
2022-01-31 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Education Finance |
Same As/Similar To
SF4124 (Similar To) 2022-03-21 - Authors added Putnam; Rest