MN HF2624 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on May 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-23 - Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Environment and Natural Resources Finance and Policy
Pending: House Environment and Natural Resources Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-23 - Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Environment and Natural Resources Finance and Policy
Pending: House Environment and Natural Resources Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Property assessed clean energy program modified.
Title
Property assessed clean energy program modified.
Sponsors
Rep. Todd Lippert [D] | Rep. Greg Boe [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-23 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Environment and Natural Resources Finance and Policy |
2022-03-17 | House | Author added Boe |
2021-05-13 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Climate and Energy Finance and Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF3060 (Similar To) 2022-03-03 - Second reading