MN HF2597 | 2009-2010 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-4)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-24 - House: Motion to return bill to author, motion prevailed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-24 - House: Motion to return bill to author, motion prevailed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Board of Medical Practice limited from bringing a disciplinary action against a physician for prescribing, administering, or dispensing long-term antibiotic therapy for chronic Lyme disease.
Title
Board of Medical Practice limited from bringing a disciplinary action against a physician for prescribing, administering, or dispensing long-term antibiotic therapy for chronic Lyme disease.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-24 | House: Motion to return bill to author, motion prevailed | |
2010-02-16 | House: Author added Anzelc | |
2010-02-08 | House: Authors added Anderson, B.; Shimanski and Kiffmeyeer | |
2010-02-04 | House: Introduction and first reading, referred to Health Care and Human Services Policy and Oversight |
Minnesota State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.revisor.mn.gov/revisor/pages/search_status/status_detail.php?b=House&f=HF2597&ssn=0&y=2009 |
Text | http://wdoc.house.leg.state.mn.us/leg/LS86/HF2597.0.pdf |