MN HF2576 | 2015-2016 | 89th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Introduced on March 8 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-14 - Author added Loeffler.
Pending: House Higher Education Policy and Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 8 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-14 - Author added Loeffler.
Pending: House Higher Education Policy and Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Loan forgiveness program awareness promoted.
Title
Loan forgiveness program awareness promoted.
Sponsors
Sen. Erin Murphy [D] | Rep. Cheryl Youakim [D] | Sen. Jason Isaacson [D] | Rep. Connie Bernardy [D] |
Rep. Jeff Backer [R] | Rep. Diane Loeffler [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-14 | House | Author added Loeffler. |
2016-04-11 | House | Author added Backer. |
2016-04-06 | House | Author added Bernardy. |
2016-03-31 | House | Author added Isaacson. |
2016-03-14 | House | Author added Youakim. |
2016-03-08 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Higher Education Policy and Finance |
Same As/Similar To
SF2487 (Similar To) 2016-03-29 - Author added Franzen