MN HF2570 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on March 31 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-04 - Author added Schultz.
Pending: House Government Operations and Elections Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 31 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-04 - Author added Schultz.
Pending: House Government Operations and Elections Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Minnesota secure choice retirement program established.
Title
Minnesota secure choice retirement program established.
Sponsors
Rep. Jamie Becker-finn [D] | Rep. Paul Thissen [D] | Rep. Connie Bernardy [D] | Rep. Jason Metsa [D] |
Rep. Mike Freiberg [D] | Sen. Erin Maye Quade [D] | Rep. Ben Lien [D] | Rep. Fue Lee [D] |
Rep. Jennifer Schultz [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-04 | House | Author added Schultz. |
2017-04-27 | House | Author added Lee. |
2017-04-03 | House | Author added Lien. |
2017-03-31 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Government Operations and Elections Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF2303 (Similar To) 2017-04-18 - Author added Dziedzic