MN HF2536 | 2015-2016 | 89th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-2)
Status: Introduced on March 8 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-30 - Authors added Erhardt, Hornstein, Pierson, Baker, and Mahoney.
Pending: House Public Safety and Crime Prevention Policy and Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 8 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-30 - Authors added Erhardt, Hornstein, Pierson, Baker, and Mahoney.
Pending: House Public Safety and Crime Prevention Policy and Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Missing persons notification and response systems and development training enhancement funding provided, membership fee for Crime Alert Network repealed, and money appropriated.
Title
Missing persons notification and response systems and development training enhancement funding provided, membership fee for Crime Alert Network repealed, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-30 | House | Authors added Erhardt, Hornstein, Pierson, Baker, and Mahoney. |
2016-03-14 | House | Authors added Poppe and Considine. |
2016-03-08 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Public Safety and Crime Prevention Policy and Finance |
Same As/Similar To
SF3026 (Similar To) 2016-03-21 - Referred to Finance