MN HF2529 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on March 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-16 - Bill was not passed as amended 81 votes required
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-16 - Bill was not passed as amended 81 votes required
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Omnibus capital investment bill.
Title
Omnibus capital investment bill.
Sponsors
Rep. Mary Murphy [D] | Rep. Leon Lillie [D] | Rep. Fue Lee [D] | Rep. Rick Hansen [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-05-16 - House - House: CALENDAR FOR THE DAY (Y: 75 N: 58 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-16 | House | Bill was not passed as amended 81 votes required |
2020-05-16 | House | Third reading as amended |
2020-05-16 | House | Point of order raised, ruled not well taken |
2020-05-16 | House | Amended |
2020-05-15 | House | Author added Hansen |
2020-05-14 | House | House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Saturday, May 16, 2020 |
2020-05-12 | House | Second reading |
2020-05-12 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended |
2019-04-11 | House | Division action, to adopt as amended and return to Ways and Means |
2019-04-11 | House | Author added Lee |
2019-03-28 | House | Author added Lillie |
2019-03-15 | House | Referred by Chair to Capital Investment Division |
2019-03-14 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Ways and Means |
Same As/Similar To
SF4600 (Similar To) 2020-05-12 - Referred to Capital Investment