MN HF2514 | 2015-2016 | 89th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 10 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-10 - Secretary of State Chapter 94 05/06/16
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 10 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-10 - Secretary of State Chapter 94 05/06/16
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Host community economic development grants modified.
Title
Host community economic development grants modified.
Sponsors
Rep. Roz Peterson [R] | Rep. Joe Atkins [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-05-03 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-21 - House - House: Passage (Y: 93 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-21 - House - House: Passage (Y: 93 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-10 | Secretary of State Chapter 94 05/06/16 | |
2016-05-06 | Governor's action Approval | |
2016-05-06 | Secretary of State, Filed | |
2016-05-04 | Presented to Governor | |
2016-05-04 | House | Returned from Senate |
2016-05-03 | Senate | Third reading Passed vote: 47-10 |
2016-05-03 | Senate | Special Order |
2016-04-26 | Senate | Second reading |
2016-04-26 | Senate | Comm report: Subst. for SF on General Orders SF2995 |
2016-04-25 | Senate | Referred to Rules and Administration for comparison with SF2995, now on General Orders |
2016-04-25 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
2016-04-25 | Senate | Received from House |
2016-04-21 | House | Bill was passed vote: 93-37 |
2016-04-21 | House | Third reading |
2016-04-20 | House | House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Thursday, April 21, 2016 |
2016-03-21 | House | Second reading |
2016-03-21 | House | Committee report, to adopt |
2016-03-08 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Job Growth and Energy Affordability Policy and Finance |
Same As/Similar To
SF2995 (Similar To) 2016-04-26 - HF substituted on General Orders HF2514