MN HF2507 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on April 9 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-24 - Authors added Urdahl and Davids
Pending: House State Government Finance and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 9 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-24 - Authors added Urdahl and Davids
Pending: House State Government Finance and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Minnesota State Retirement System; eligibility extended for a Rule of 90 unreduced early retirement benefit by one month to members hired after June 30, 1989, and before August 1, 1989.
Title
Minnesota State Retirement System; eligibility extended for a Rule of 90 unreduced early retirement benefit by one month to members hired after June 30, 1989, and before August 1, 1989.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-24 | House | Authors added Urdahl and Davids |
2021-04-09 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to State Government Finance and Elections |
Same As/Similar To
SF2417 (Similar To) 2021-04-14 - Referred to State Government Finance and Policy and Elections