MN HF2506 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on April 9 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-24 - Authors added Urdahl and Davids
Pending: House State Government Finance and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 9 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-24 - Authors added Urdahl and Davids
Pending: House State Government Finance and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Minnesota State Retirement System; eligibility extended for a Rule of 90 unreduced early retirement benefit by one month to members hired after June 30, 1989, and before August 1, 1989, upon payment of the actuarial cost of the increased benefit.
Title
Minnesota State Retirement System; eligibility extended for a Rule of 90 unreduced early retirement benefit by one month to members hired after June 30, 1989, and before August 1, 1989, upon payment of the actuarial cost of the increased benefit.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-24 | House | Authors added Urdahl and Davids |
2021-04-09 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to State Government Finance and Elections |
Same As/Similar To
SF2418 (Similar To) 2021-04-14 - Referred to State Government Finance and Policy and Elections