MN HF2506 | 2011-2012 | 87th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on April 24 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-24 - Secretary of State Chapter 206 04/23/12
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on April 24 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-24 - Secretary of State Chapter 206 04/23/12
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
School district reserved staff development revenue allocation requirement stricken.
Title
School district reserved staff development revenue allocation requirement stricken.
Sponsors
Rep. Jenifer Loon [R] | Rep. Denise Dittrich [D] | Rep. Debra Kiel [R] | Rep. Carol McFarlane [R] |
Rep. Bob Dettmer [R] | Sen. Mary Kiffmeyer [R] | Sen. Carla Nelson [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-04-18 - House - Repassage, as amended by the Senate (Y: 73 N: 54 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-29 - House - Passage (Y: 78 N: 51 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-29 - House - (Y: 73 N: 55 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-29 - House - (Y: 72 N: 57 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-29 - House - Passage (Y: 78 N: 51 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-29 - House - (Y: 73 N: 55 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-29 - House - (Y: 72 N: 57 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-24 | Secretary of State Chapter 206 04/23/12 | |
2012-04-23 | Governor's action Approval | |
2012-04-19 | House | Author added Kiffmeyer |
2012-04-18 | House | Bill was repassed as amended by the Senate vote: 73-54 |
2012-04-18 | House | Third reading as amended by the Senate |
2012-04-18 | House | Motion prevailed |
2012-04-18 | House | Motion to concur with Senate amendments |
2012-04-18 | House | Returned from Senate with amendment |
2012-04-18 | Senate | House concurred and repassed bill |
2012-04-05 | Senate | Third reading Passed vote: 56-6 |
2012-04-05 | Senate | Taken from table |
2012-04-05 | Senate | Laid on table |
2012-04-05 | Senate | Special Order |
2012-04-02 | Senate | Second reading |
2012-04-02 | Senate | Comm report: Rule 45-amend, subst. General Orders SF2059 |
2012-04-02 | House | Author stricken Slocum |
2012-03-30 | Senate | Referred to Rules and Administration |
2012-03-30 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
2012-03-30 | Senate | Received from House |
2012-03-29 | House | Bill was passed vote: 78-51 |
2012-03-29 | House | Third reading |
2012-03-29 | House | Point of order raised, ruled well taken Multiple points of order raised, ruled well taken |
2012-03-29 | House | Amendments offered |
2012-03-29 | House | Reported to the House |
2012-03-26 | House | Author added Dettmer |
2012-03-14 | House | House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day |
2012-03-12 | House | Second reading |
2012-03-12 | House | Committee report, to pass |
2012-03-01 | House | Author added Slocum |
2012-02-27 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Education Finance |