MN HF2458 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-3)
Status: Introduced on April 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-07 - Author added Christensen
Pending: House Judiciary Finance and Civil Law Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-07 - Author added Christensen
Pending: House Judiciary Finance and Civil Law Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Blind parents rights provided.
Title
Blind parents rights provided.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-07 | House | Author added Christensen |
2022-02-03 | House | Authors added Edelson, Youakim, Her, Freiberg, Dettmer, Pierson, Boldon, Liebling, Moller, Frazier, Lippert, Feist, Boe, and Agbaje |
2021-04-06 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Judiciary Finance and Civil Law |
Same As/Similar To
SF1370 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Author added Anderson