MN HF2413 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on March 14 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-26 - Author added Munson
Pending: House Civil Law and Data Practices Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Parenting presumptions modified.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Parenting presumptions modified.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-26HouseAuthor added Munson
2018-02-20HouseAuthor added Dettmer.
2017-03-14HouseIntroduction and first reading, referred to Civil Law and Data Practices Policy

Same As/Similar To

SF2141 (Similar To) 2017-03-15 - Referred to Judiciary and Public Safety Finance and Policy

Minnesota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback