MN HF2394 | 2015-2016 | 89th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on March 8 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-11 - Author added Thissen.
Pending: House Health and Human Services Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 8 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-11 - Author added Thissen.
Pending: House Health and Human Services Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Minnesota Security Hospital at St. Peter renovation and expansion funding provided, bonds issued, and money appropriated.
Title
Minnesota Security Hospital at St. Peter renovation and expansion funding provided, bonds issued, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-11 | House | Author added Thissen. |
2016-03-10 | House | Author added Bly. |
2016-03-08 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Health and Human Services Finance |
Same As/Similar To
SF2596 (Similar To) 2016-03-14 - Referred to Capital Investment