MN HF2361 | 2013-2014 | 88th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 25 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-26 - Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Health and Human Services Finance
Pending: House Health and Human Services Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 25 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-26 - Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Health and Human Services Finance
Pending: House Health and Human Services Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Health disparities in minority populations addressed and health priorities of minority populations identified, health disparities task force created, and money appropriated.
Title
Health disparities in minority populations addressed and health priorities of minority populations identified, health disparities task force created, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-26 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Health and Human Services Finance |
2014-03-20 | House | Author added Loeffler |
2014-03-13 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Government Operations |
2014-03-03 | House | Author added Slocum |
2014-02-25 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Health and Human Services Policy |