MN HF232 | 2023-2024 | 93rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-1)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-16 - Author added Tabke
Pending: House Economic Development Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-16 - Author added Tabke
Pending: House Economic Development Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Explore Minnesota Tourism funding provided, and money appropriated.
Title
Explore Minnesota Tourism funding provided, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-16 | House | Author added Tabke |
2023-03-06 | House | Author added PĂ©rez-Vega |
2023-03-02 | House | Author added Elkins |
2023-02-13 | House | Author added Norris |
2023-01-25 | House | Author added Bliss |
2023-01-17 | House | Author added Becker-Finn and Kotyza-Witthuhn |
2023-01-11 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Economic Development Finance and Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF1794 (Similar To) 2024-02-12 - Author stricken Rasmusson