MN HF2317 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 19-0)
Status: Introduced on March 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-20 - Author added Davids
Pending: House Greater Minnesota Jobs and Economic Development Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-20 - Author added Davids
Pending: House Greater Minnesota Jobs and Economic Development Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Disaster assistance contingency account funding received.
Title
Disaster assistance contingency account funding received.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-20 | House | Author added Davids |
2019-03-14 | House | Author added Lueck |
2019-03-13 | House | Authors added Scott, Kiel, and Haley |
2019-03-11 | House | Referred by Chair to Greater Minnesota Jobs and Economic Development Finance Division |
2019-03-11 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Ways and Means |
Same As/Similar To
SF2408 (Similar To) 2019-03-13 - Referred to Judiciary and Public Safety Finance and Policy