MN HF2310 | 2023-2024 | 93rd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 24 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-24 - Secretary of State Chapter 60
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 24 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-24 - Secretary of State Chapter 60
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Environment, natural resources, climate, and energy finance and policy bill.
Title
Environment, natural resources, climate, and energy finance and policy bill.
Sponsors
Rep. Rick Hansen [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-05-18 - House - House: H.F. NO. 2310 (Y: 72 N: 57 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-18 - House - House: H.F. NO. 2310 (Y: 60 N: 68 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-05-18 - House - House: H.F. NO. 2310 (Y: 126 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-18 - House - House: H.F. NO. 2310 (Y: 121 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-18 - Senate - Senate: Third reading (Y: 35 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-18 - Senate - Senate: Senate adopted CC report and repassed bill (Y: 35 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-18 - Senate - Senate: Motion to reject CC report, did not prevail (Y: 33 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-05-17 - House - House: H.F. NO. 2310 (Y: 129 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-20 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 37 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-17 - House - House: Passage, as amended (Y: 69 N: 59 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-17 - House - House: Garofalo - Amendment - H2310A56 (Y: 58 N: 70 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-04-17 - House - House: Scott - Amendment - H2310A23 (Y: 59 N: 69 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-04-17 - House - House: 59 - Amendment to Swedzinski Amendment - Nays (Y: 69 N: 59 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-17 - House - House: Igo - Amendment - H2310A36 (Y: 60 N: 68 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-04-17 - House - House: 69 - Amendment to Igo Amendment - Nays (Y: 59 N: 69 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-04-17 - House - House: Swedzinski - Amendment - H2310A31 (Y: 59 N: 69 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-04-17 - House - House: Igo - Amendment - H2310A39 (Y: 59 N: 68 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-04-17 - House - House: Quam - Amendment - A23-0124 (Y: 59 N: 69 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-04-17 - House - House: 69 - Amendment to Quam Amendment - Nays (Y: 59 N: 69 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-04-17 - House - House: Quam - Amendment - H2310A45 (Y: 59 N: 69 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-04-17 - House - House: Heintzeman - Amendment - H2310A49 (Y: 61 N: 66 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-04-17 - House - House: Fischer - Amendment - H2310A30 (Y: 69 N: 57 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-17 - House - House: Hansen, R. - Amendment - H2310A50 (Y: 109 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-17 - House - House: CALL OF THE HOUSE (Y: 128 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-18 - House - House: H.F. NO. 2310 (Y: 60 N: 68 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-05-18 - House - House: H.F. NO. 2310 (Y: 126 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-18 - House - House: H.F. NO. 2310 (Y: 121 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-18 - Senate - Senate: Third reading (Y: 35 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-18 - Senate - Senate: Senate adopted CC report and repassed bill (Y: 35 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-18 - Senate - Senate: Motion to reject CC report, did not prevail (Y: 33 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-05-17 - House - House: H.F. NO. 2310 (Y: 129 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-20 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 37 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-17 - House - House: Passage, as amended (Y: 69 N: 59 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-17 - House - House: Garofalo - Amendment - H2310A56 (Y: 58 N: 70 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-04-17 - House - House: Scott - Amendment - H2310A23 (Y: 59 N: 69 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-04-17 - House - House: 59 - Amendment to Swedzinski Amendment - Nays (Y: 69 N: 59 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-17 - House - House: Igo - Amendment - H2310A36 (Y: 60 N: 68 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-04-17 - House - House: 69 - Amendment to Igo Amendment - Nays (Y: 59 N: 69 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-04-17 - House - House: Swedzinski - Amendment - H2310A31 (Y: 59 N: 69 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-04-17 - House - House: Igo - Amendment - H2310A39 (Y: 59 N: 68 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-04-17 - House - House: Quam - Amendment - A23-0124 (Y: 59 N: 69 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-04-17 - House - House: 69 - Amendment to Quam Amendment - Nays (Y: 59 N: 69 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-04-17 - House - House: Quam - Amendment - H2310A45 (Y: 59 N: 69 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-04-17 - House - House: Heintzeman - Amendment - H2310A49 (Y: 61 N: 66 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-04-17 - House - House: Fischer - Amendment - H2310A30 (Y: 69 N: 57 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-17 - House - House: Hansen, R. - Amendment - H2310A50 (Y: 109 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-17 - House - House: CALL OF THE HOUSE (Y: 128 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-24 | Secretary of State Chapter 60 | |
2023-05-24 | Governor's action Approval | |
2023-05-24 | Secretary of State, Filed | |
2023-05-24 | Governor approval | |
2023-05-23 | Presented to Governor | |
2023-05-19 | House | Senate adopted conference committee report, bill repassed |
2023-05-18 | Senate | Third reading |
2023-05-18 | Senate | Senate adopted CC report and repassed bill |
2023-05-18 | Senate | Motion to reject CC report, did not prevail |
2023-05-18 | Senate | Conference committee report, delete everything |
2023-05-18 | Senate | House adopted HCC report and repassed bill |
2023-05-18 | House | Bill was repassed as amended by Conference |
2023-05-18 | House | Third reading as amended by Conference |
2023-05-18 | House | Motion prevailed |
2023-05-18 | House | Motion to adopt conference committee report |
2023-05-18 | House | Motion did not prevail |
2023-05-18 | House | Motion to return bill to conference committee |
2023-05-18 | House | Motion prevailed |
2023-05-18 | House | Motion for reconsideration of adoption of conference committee report |
2023-05-18 | House | Third reading as amended by Conference |
2023-05-18 | House | House adopted conference committee report |
2023-05-18 | House | Conference committee report, delete everything |
2023-05-17 | House | Motion prevailed |
2023-05-17 | House | Motion to return bill to conference committee |
2023-05-17 | House | Motion prevailed |
2023-05-17 | House | Motion to take from table |
2023-05-17 | House | Laid on table conference committee report |
2023-05-17 | House | Point of order raised |
2023-05-17 | House | Motion to adopt conference committee report |
2023-05-17 | House | Conference committee report, delete everything |
2023-04-25 | Senate | Senate conferees Hawj; Frentz; McEwen; Xiong; Coleman |
2023-04-25 | House | Senate conferees Hawj; Frentz; McEwen; Xiong; Coleman |
2023-04-25 | House | Senate accedes, conference committee of 5 be appointed |
2023-04-24 | Senate | Senate accedes, CC of 5 be appointed |
2023-04-24 | Senate | House conferees Hansen, R; Acomb; Hollins; Jordan; Kraft |
2023-04-24 | Senate | House not concur, conference committee of 5 requested |
2023-04-24 | House | House conferees Hansen, R.; Acomb; Hollins; Jordan; Kraft |
2023-04-21 | House | House refuses to concur, conference committee of 5 requested |
2023-04-21 | House | Returned from Senate with amendment |
2023-04-20 | Senate | Third reading Passed |
2023-04-20 | Senate | Special Order: Amended |
2023-04-19 | Senate | Second reading |
2023-04-19 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended |
2023-04-18 | Senate | Referred to Finance |
2023-04-18 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
2023-04-18 | Senate | Received from House |
2023-04-17 | House | Bill was passed as amended |
2023-04-17 | House | Third reading as amended |
2023-04-17 | House | Amendments offered |
2023-04-17 | House | Motion prevailed |
2023-04-17 | House | Motion to suspend rules relating to House Rule 3.33 |
2023-04-17 | House | Amendments offered |
2023-04-17 | House | Motion prevailed |
2023-04-17 | House | Motion to suspend rules relating to House Rule 3.33 |
2023-04-17 | House | Amended |
2023-04-13 | House | House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Monday, April 17, 2023 |
2023-04-12 | House | Second reading |
2023-04-12 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended |
2023-04-04 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Ways and Means |
2023-03-06 | House | Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Environment and Natural Resources Finance and Policy |
2023-03-01 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Rules and Legislative Administration |
Same As/Similar To
SF2438 (Similar To) 2023-04-11 - Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Finance