MN HF2304 | 2023-2024 | 93rd Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 1 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-23 - Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Water use permit issuance authorized and modification prohibited, White Bear Lake Area Water Use Work Group established, comprehensive plan required, and money appropriated.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Water use permit issuance authorized and modification prohibited, White Bear Lake Area Water Use Work Group established, comprehensive plan required, and money appropriated.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-03-23HouseCommittee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Ways and Means
2023-03-20HouseAuthor added Lillie
2023-03-01HouseIntroduction and first reading, referred to Environment and Natural Resources Finance and Policy

Same As/Similar To

SF2047 (Similar To) 2023-03-09 - Comm report: To pass and re-referred to State and Local Government and Veterans

Minnesota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback