MN HF2297 | 2023-2024 | 93rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on February 28 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-04-04 - Author added Gomez
Pending: House Education Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 28 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-04-04 - Author added Gomez
Pending: House Education Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
School districts and charter schools required to provide climate justice instruction, and report required.
Title
School districts and charter schools required to provide climate justice instruction, and report required.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-04 | House | Author added Gomez |
2024-03-14 | House | Author added Hanson, J. |
2024-03-13 | House | Author added Elkins |
2023-03-01 | House | Author added Hemmingsen-Jaeger |
2023-02-28 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Education Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF476 (Similar To) 2023-02-21 - Comm report: To pass and re-referred to Education Finance