MN HF229 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-11 - Author added Moller
Pending: House Agriculture and Food Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-11 - Author added Moller
Pending: House Agriculture and Food Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Farmed Cervidae additional fencing requirements established.
Title
Farmed Cervidae additional fencing requirements established.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-11 | House | Author added Moller |
2019-02-27 | House | Author added Kunesh-Podein |
2019-02-25 | House | Authors added Richardson and Tabke |
2019-02-21 | House | Author added Nelson |
2019-01-24 | House | Author added Loeffler |
2019-01-22 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Agriculture and Food Finance and Policy Division |
Same As/Similar To
SF1015 (Similar To) 2019-03-11 - Author added Ingebrigtsen