MN HF2286 | 2023-2024 | 93rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on February 27 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-03-28 - HF indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 27 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-03-28 - HF indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Commissioner of human services procedures established related to the transition from the public health emergency, and money appropriated.
Title
Commissioner of human services procedures established related to the transition from the public health emergency, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
Rep. Mohamud Noor [D] | Rep. Tina Liebling [D] | Rep. Peter Fischer [D] | Rep. Aisha Gomez [D] |
Rep. Hodan Hassan [D] | Rep. Andrew Smith [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-28 | House | HF indefinitely postponed |
2023-03-28 | House | Bills not identical, SF substituted on General Register |
2023-03-27 | House | Referred to Chief Clerk for comparison with SF2265 |
2023-03-23 | House | Second reading |
2023-03-23 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended |
2023-03-13 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Ways and Means |
2023-03-08 | House | Author added Smith |
2023-03-01 | House | Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Health Finance and Policy |
2023-02-27 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Human Services Finance |
Same As/Similar To
SF2265 (Similar To) 2023-04-03 - Returned from House