MN HF2276 | 2023-2024 | 93rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Introduced on February 27 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-04-11 - Author added Stephenson
Pending: House Capital Investment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 27 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-04-11 - Author added Stephenson
Pending: House Capital Investment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Minneapolis; Parents in Community Action funding provided, and money appropriated.
Title
Minneapolis; Parents in Community Action funding provided, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-11 | House | Author added Stephenson |
2023-04-03 | House | Author added Sencer-Mura |
2023-02-27 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Capital Investment |
Same As/Similar To
SF1851 (Similar To) 2023-03-09 - Author added Champion