MN SF1851 | 2023-2024 | 93rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 20 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-09 - Author added Champion
Pending: Senate Capital Investment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 20 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-09 - Author added Champion
Pending: Senate Capital Investment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Minneapolis Parents in Community Action appropriation
Title
Minneapolis Parents in Community Action appropriation
Sponsors
Sen. Omar Fateh [D] | Sen. Susan Pha [D] | Sen. Bobby Champion [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-09 | Senate | Author added Champion |
2023-03-02 | Senate | Author added Pha |
2023-02-20 | Senate | Referred to Capital Investment |
2023-02-20 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF2276 (Similar To) 2023-04-11 - Author added Stephenson