MN HF2253 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on April 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-26 - Secretary of State Chapter 12
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on April 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-26 - Secretary of State Chapter 12
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Workers' Compensation Advisory Council recommendations adopted.
Title
Workers' Compensation Advisory Council recommendations adopted.
Sponsors
Rep. Mike Sundin [D] | Rep. Tony Albright [R] | Rep. Emma Greenman [D] | Rep. Rob Ecklund [D] |
Rep. Dave Lislegard [D] | Rep. Heather Keeler [D] | Rep. Dan Wolgamott [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-21 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - House - House: H.F. NO. 2253 (Y: 128 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - House - House: H.F. NO. 2253 (Y: 125 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - House - House: H.F. NO. 2253 (Y: 128 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - House - House: H.F. NO. 2253 (Y: 125 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-26 | Secretary of State Chapter 12 | |
2021-04-26 | Governor's action Approval | |
2021-04-26 | Secretary of State, Filed | |
2021-04-26 | Governor approval | |
2021-04-23 | Presented to Governor | |
2021-04-21 | House | Returned from Senate |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Third reading Passed |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Special Order |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Taken from table |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Laid on table |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Second reading |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Taken from table |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Laid on table |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Received from House |
2021-03-25 | House | Bill was passed |
2021-03-25 | House | Third reading |
2021-03-25 | House | Second reading |
2021-03-25 | House | Motion prevailed |
2021-03-25 | House | Motion to suspend rules |
2021-03-25 | House | Joint rule 2.03, Deadlines, re-referred to Rules and Legislative Administration |
2021-03-25 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Ways and Means |
2021-03-17 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Labor, Industry, Veterans and Military Affairs Finance and Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF2143 (Similar To) 2021-04-06 - Comm report: Adopt previous comm report Jt rule 2.03 suspended