MN HF2200 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on March 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-26 - Authors added Hausman, Howard, and Fischer
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-26 - Authors added Hausman, Howard, and Fischer
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Omnibus agriculture and food finance bill.
Title
Omnibus agriculture and food finance bill.
Sponsors
Rep. Jeanne Poppe [D] | Rep. Jeff Brand [D] | Rep. Rob Ecklund [D] | Rep. Alice Hausman [D] |
Rep. Michael Howard [D] | Rep. Peter Fischer [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-26 | House | Authors added Hausman, Howard, and Fischer |
2019-04-24 | House | HF indefinitely postponed |
2019-04-24 | House | Bills not identical, SF substituted on General Register |
2019-04-23 | House | Referred to Chief Clerk for comparison with SF2226 |
2019-04-12 | House | Second reading |
2019-04-12 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended |
2019-04-04 | House | Division action, to adopt as amended and return to Ways and Means |
2019-03-07 | House | Referred by Chair to Agriculture and Food Finance and Policy Division |
2019-03-07 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Ways and Means |
Same As/Similar To
SF2226 (Similar To) 2019-05-20 - Motion prevailed