MN HF213 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-10 - Author added Gruenhagen
Pending: House State Government Finance and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-10 - Author added Gruenhagen
Pending: House State Government Finance and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provisional balloting procedure established.
Title
Provisional balloting procedure established.
Sponsors
Sen. Steve Drazkowski [R] | Rep. Jeremy Munson [R] | Rep. Erik Mortensen [R] | Rep. Tim Miller [R] |
Sen. Eric Lucero [R] | Sen. Cal Bahr [R] | Sen. Glenn Gruenhagen [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-10 | House | Author added Gruenhagen |
2022-02-07 | House | Author added Bahr |
2021-02-25 | House | Author added Lucero |
2021-01-21 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to State Government Finance and Elections |