MN HF2126 | 2009-2010 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Introduced on March 25 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-01 - House: Author added Abeler
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 25 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-01 - House: Author added Abeler
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Minnesota residents permitted to buy health coverage approved in other states, Physician's Council on Health Care Policy created to analyze health coverage mandates, and tax credit provided for persons without access to employer-based coverage.
Title
Minnesota residents permitted to buy health coverage approved in other states, Physician's Council on Health Care Policy created to analyze health coverage mandates, and tax credit provided for persons without access to employer-based coverage.
Sponsors
Sen. Jim Abeler [R] | Rep. Michael Beard [R] | Rep. Laura Brod [R] | Rep. Matthew Dean [R] |
Rep. Bob Dettmer [R] | Rep. Keith Downey [R] | Rep. Thomas Emmer [R] | Rep. Steve Gottwalt [R] |
Rep. Jenifer Loon [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-01 | House: Author added Abeler | |
2009-03-30 | House: Author added Dettmer | |
2009-03-26 | House: Author added Beard | |
2009-03-25 | House: Introduction and first reading, referred to Health Care and Human Services Policy and Oversight |
Minnesota State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.revisor.mn.gov/revisor/pages/search_status/status_detail.php?b=House&f=HF2126&ssn=0&y=2009 |
Text | http://wdoc.house.leg.state.mn.us/leg/LS86/HF2126.0.pdf |