MN HF2090 | 2013-2014 | 88th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 16 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-16 - Secretary of State Chapter 257
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 16 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-16 - Secretary of State Chapter 257
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Indemnification agreements in design professional services contracts prohibited.
Title
Indemnification agreements in design professional services contracts prohibited.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-05-06 - House - House: Repassage (Y: 128 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-07 - House - House: Passage (Y: 130 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-07 - House - House: Passage (Y: 130 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-16 | Secretary of State Chapter 257 | |
2014-05-16 | Governor's action Approval | |
2014-05-16 | Secretary of State, Filed | |
2014-05-13 | Presented to Governor | |
2014-05-13 | House | Senate adopted conference committee report, bill repassed vote: 56-0 |
2014-05-12 | Senate | Third reading vote: 56-0 |
2014-05-12 | Senate | Senate adopted CC report and repassed bill |
2014-05-12 | Senate | Conference committee report |
2014-05-12 | Senate | House adopted HCC report and repassed bill |
2014-05-06 | House | Bill was repassed as amended by Conference vote: 128-0 |
2014-05-06 | House | Third reading as amended by Conference |
2014-05-06 | House | House adopted conference committee report |
2014-05-06 | House | Conference committee report |
2014-05-01 | Senate | Senate conferee change Hall replaces Limmer |
2014-05-01 | House | Senate conferee change Limmer (stricken), Hall (added) |
2014-04-30 | Senate | Senate conferee change Limmer replaces Newman |
2014-04-30 | House | Senate conferee change Newman (stricken), Limmer (added) |
2014-04-29 | House | Senate conferees Latz, Jensen, Newman |
2014-04-29 | House | Senate accedes, conference committee of 3 be appointed |
2014-04-28 | House | Author added Newton |
2014-04-28 | House | House conferees Hortman, Scott, Simon |
2014-04-28 | House | House refuses to concur, conference committee of 3 requested |
2014-04-28 | House | Returned from Senate with amendment |
2014-04-28 | Senate | Senate conferees Latz; Jensen; Newman |
2014-04-28 | Senate | Senate accedes, CC of 3 be appointed |
2014-04-28 | Senate | House conferees Hortman; Scott; Simon |
2014-04-28 | Senate | House not concur, conference committee of 3 requested |
2014-04-24 | Senate | Third reading Passed vote: 59-0 |
2014-04-24 | Senate | Special Order: Amended |
2014-04-09 | Senate | Second reading |
2014-04-09 | Senate | Comm report: Subst. for SF on General Orders SF1757 |
2014-04-08 | Senate | Referred to Rules and Administration for comparison with SF1757, now on General Orders |
2014-04-08 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
2014-04-08 | Senate | Received from House |
2014-04-07 | House | Bill was passed vote: 130-0 |
2014-04-07 | House | Third reading |
2014-04-03 | House | House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Monday, April 7, 2014 |
2014-03-12 | House | Author added Scott |
2014-03-12 | House | Second reading |
2014-03-12 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended |
2014-02-25 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Civil Law |