MN HF2083 | 2011-2012 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 24-0)
Status: Vetoed on April 5 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-05 - Governor's action Veto Chapter 154
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on April 5 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-05 - Governor's action Veto Chapter 154
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Omnibus K-12 bill.
Title
Omnibus K-12 bill.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-04-02 - House - Repassage, as amended by Conference (Y: 75 N: 56 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-02 - House - Garofalo motion Refuse to Adopt (Y: 55 N: 72 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-03-15 - House - Passage (Y: 74 N: 59 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-15 - House - (Y: 73 N: 59 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-15 - House - (Y: 72 N: 61 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-15 - House - Amendment (Y: 59 N: 73 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-03-13 - House - (Y: 71 N: 60 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-13 - House - Adoption of the Majority Report (Y: 72 N: 59 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-13 - House - (Y: 71 N: 60 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-13 - House - Dean motion to Lay on the Table (Y: 72 N: 57 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-02 - House - Garofalo motion Refuse to Adopt (Y: 55 N: 72 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-03-15 - House - Passage (Y: 74 N: 59 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-15 - House - (Y: 73 N: 59 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-15 - House - (Y: 72 N: 61 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-15 - House - Amendment (Y: 59 N: 73 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-03-13 - House - (Y: 71 N: 60 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-13 - House - Adoption of the Majority Report (Y: 72 N: 59 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-13 - House - (Y: 71 N: 60 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-13 - House - Dean motion to Lay on the Table (Y: 72 N: 57 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-05 | Governor's action Veto Chapter 154 | |
2012-04-03 | House | Senate adopted conference committee report, bill repassed |
2012-04-02 | Senate | Third reading vote: 35-28 |
2012-04-02 | Senate | Senate adopted CC report and repassed bill |
2012-04-02 | Senate | Conference committee report, delete everything |
2012-04-02 | Senate | House adopted HCC report and repassed bill |
2012-04-02 | House | Bill was repassed as amended by Conference vote: 75-56 |
2012-04-02 | House | Third reading as amended by Conference |
2012-04-02 | House | House adopted conference committee report question recurred |
2012-04-02 | House | Motion did not prevail vote: 55-72 |
2012-04-02 | House | Motion to return bill to conference committee |
2012-04-02 | House | Motion to adopt conference committee report |
2012-04-02 | House | Conference committee report, delete everything |
2012-03-28 | House | Senate conferees Olson, Daley, Kruse, Pederson, Lillie |
2012-03-28 | House | Senate accedes, conference committee of 5 be appointed |
2012-03-27 | House | House conferees Garofalo, Kelly, Loon, Woodard, Greiling |
2012-03-27 | House | House refuses to concur, conference committee of 5 requested |
2012-03-27 | House | Returned from Senate with amendment |
2012-03-27 | Senate | Senate conferees Olson; Daley; Kruse; Pederson; Lillie |
2012-03-27 | Senate | Senate accedes, CC of 5 be appointed |
2012-03-27 | Senate | House conferees Garofalo; Kelly; Loon; Woodard; Greiling |
2012-03-27 | Senate | House not concur, conference committee of 5 requested |
2012-03-26 | Senate | Third reading Passed vote: 35-29 |
2012-03-26 | Senate | Special Order: Amended |
2012-03-23 | Senate | Second reading |
2012-03-23 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended |
2012-03-22 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Finance |
2012-03-19 | Senate | Referred to Education |
2012-03-19 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
2012-03-19 | Senate | Received from House |
2012-03-15 | House | Bill was passed vote: 74-59 |
2012-03-15 | House | Third reading |
2012-03-15 | House | Point of order raised, ruled well taken |
2012-03-15 | House | Point of order raised, ruled well taken |
2012-03-15 | House | Amendments offered |
2012-03-15 | House | Reported to the House |
2012-03-14 | House | Authors added Lohmer, Barrett, Sanders, Schomacker, Scott, Gottwalt, Peterson, B.; and Shimanski |
2012-03-14 | House | House rule 1.22, notice of intent to place on Fiscal Calendar Thursday, March 15, 2012 |
2012-03-14 | House | Second reading |
2012-03-14 | House | Committee report, to pass as amended |
2012-03-13 | House | Authors added Cornish, Gruenhagen, Downey, Dettmer, Benson, M.; Davids, Crawford, Woodard, Kieffer, Gunther, Banaian, Quam and Anderson, P. |
2012-03-13 | House | Point of order raised, ruled not well taken relating to notice of intent being in order vote: 71-60 |
2012-03-13 | House | Notice of intent to move reconsideration adoption of the majority report; ruled out of order |
2012-03-13 | House | Committee report, to pass question recurred on adoption of the majority report vote: 72-59 |
2012-03-13 | House | Motion to lay previous motion on the table appeal of the Speaker, that reconsideration is out of order vote: 71-60 |
2012-03-13 | House | Motion for reconsideration motion to lay the minority report on the table |
2012-03-13 | House | Motion to lay on the table minority report vote: 72-57 |
2012-03-13 | House | Minority report offered |
2012-03-13 | House | Committee report, to pass and re-refer to Ways and Means |
2012-03-12 | House | Author added Myhra |
2012-03-12 | House | Committee report, to pass as amended and re-refer to Taxes |
2012-02-01 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Education Finance |