MN HF2082 | 2011-2012 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-27 - HF indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-27 - HF indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Sandstone and its economic development authority authorized to sell a housing development.
Title
Sandstone and its economic development authority authorized to sell a housing development.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-27 | House | HF indefinitely postponed |
2012-04-27 | House | Bills identical, SF substituted on General Register |
2012-04-26 | House | Referred to Chief Clerk for comparison with SF1761 |
2012-02-15 | House | Author stricken Hilty |
2012-02-13 | House | Second reading |
2012-02-13 | House | Committee report, to pass |
2012-02-01 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Government Operations and Elections |
Minnesota State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.revisor.mn.gov/bills/bill.php?b=House&f=HF2082&ssn=0&y=2011 |
Text | https://www.revisor.mn.gov/bin/getbill.php?number=HF2082&version=0&session=ls87 |