MN HF1999 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on March 2 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-22 - Author added Lueck.
Pending: House Job Growth and Energy Affordability Policy and Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 2 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-22 - Author added Lueck.
Pending: House Job Growth and Energy Affordability Policy and Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Ely; trailhead facility and predesign of road access funding provided, bonds issued, and money appropriated.
Title
Ely; trailhead facility and predesign of road access funding provided, bonds issued, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
Rep. Rob Ecklund [D] | Rep. Jason Metsa [D] | Rep. Dale Lueck [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-22 | House | Author added Lueck. |
2018-03-14 | House | Author added Metsa. |
2017-03-02 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Job Growth and Energy Affordability Policy and Finance |
Same As/Similar To
SF1739 (Similar To) 2018-03-26 - Author added Tomassoni