MN HF1974 | 2011-2012 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Vetoed on April 27 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-27 - Governor's action Veto Chapter 245
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on April 27 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-27 - Governor's action Veto Chapter 245
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Contract terms continuance not allowed after expiration of a collective bargaining agreement.
Title
Contract terms continuance not allowed after expiration of a collective bargaining agreement.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-04-24 - House - Repassage, as amended by Conference Committee (Y: 68 N: 63 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-29 - House - Passage (Y: 68 N: 63 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-29 - House - Passage (Y: 68 N: 63 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-27 | Governor's action Veto Chapter 245 | |
2012-04-25 | House | Senate adopted conference committee report, bill repassed vote: 37-30 |
2012-04-24 | Senate | Third reading vote: 37-30 |
2012-04-24 | Senate | Senate adopted CC report and repassed bill |
2012-04-24 | Senate | Conference committee report, delete everything |
2012-04-24 | Senate | House adopted HCC report and repassed bill |
2012-04-24 | House | Bill was repassed as amended by Conference vote: 68-63 |
2012-04-24 | House | Third reading as amended by Conference |
2012-04-24 | House | House adopted conference committee report |
2012-04-24 | House | Conference committee report, delete everything |
2012-04-19 | House | Senate conferees Parry, Thompson and Hoffman |
2012-04-19 | House | Senate accedes, conference committee of 3 be appointed |
2012-04-18 | Senate | Senate conferees Parry; Thompson; Hoffman |
2012-04-18 | Senate | Senate accedes, CC of 3 be appointed |
2012-04-18 | Senate | House conferees Drazkowski; Benson, M.; Downey |
2012-04-18 | Senate | House not concur, conference committee of 3 requested |
2012-04-18 | House | House conferees Drazkowski; Benson, M.; Downey |
2012-04-17 | House | House refuses to concur, conference committee of 3 requested |
2012-04-17 | House | Returned from Senate with amendment |
2012-04-16 | Senate | Third reading Passed vote: 37-25 |
2012-04-16 | Senate | Special Order: Amended |
2012-04-02 | Senate | Second reading |
2012-04-02 | Senate | Comm report: Rule 45-amend, subst. General Orders SF2078 |
2012-03-30 | Senate | Referred to Rules and Administration |
2012-03-30 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
2012-03-30 | Senate | Received from House |
2012-03-29 | House | Bill was passed vote: 68-63 |
2012-03-29 | House | Third reading |
2012-03-26 | House | House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day |
2012-02-27 | House | Second reading |
2012-02-27 | House | Committee report, to pass as amended |
2012-02-16 | House | Committee report, to pass and re-refer to State Government Finance |
2012-01-26 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Government Operations and Elections |