MN HF1949 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on March 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-23 - Joint rule 2.03, Deadlines, re-referred to Rules and Legislative Administration
Pending: House Rules and Legislative Administration Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-23 - Joint rule 2.03, Deadlines, re-referred to Rules and Legislative Administration
Pending: House Rules and Legislative Administration Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Cloud computing defined, and consideration of cloud computing options in state agency information technology projects required.
Title
Cloud computing defined, and consideration of cloud computing options in state agency information technology projects required.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-23 | House | Joint rule 2.03, Deadlines, re-referred to Rules and Legislative Administration |
2019-04-23 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Ways and Means |
2019-04-08 | House | Author added Elkins |
2019-04-01 | House | Author added Bahner |
2019-03-04 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Government Operations |
Same As/Similar To
SF2097 (Similar To) 2019-03-07 - Referred to State Government Finance and Policy and Elections