MN HF1906 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-14 - Authors added Wazlawik and Wolgamott
Pending: House Rules and Legislative Administration Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-14 - Authors added Wazlawik and Wolgamott
Pending: House Rules and Legislative Administration Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Organ harvesting; a resolution calling for the end of Falun Gong practitioners' cold genocide and forced organ harvesting.
Title
Organ harvesting; a resolution calling for the end of Falun Gong practitioners' cold genocide and forced organ harvesting.
Sponsors
Rep. Steve Sandell [D] | Rep. Peggy Bennett [R] | Rep. Fue Lee [D] | Rep. Greg Boe [R] |
Rep. Rod Hamilton [R] | Rep. Tim Miller [R] | Rep. Julie Sandstede [D] | Sen. Cal Bahr [R] |
Rep. Dean Urdahl [R] | Rep. Jay Xiong [D] | Rep. John Heinrich [R] | Rep. Nels Pierson [R] |
Rep. Jeff Backer [R] | Rep. Jim Davnie [D] | Rep. John Poston [R] | Rep. Rob Ecklund [D] |
Rep. Connie Bernardy [D] | Rep. Sandra Masin [D] | Rep. Ami Wazlawik [D] | Rep. Dan Wolgamott [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-14 | House | Authors added Wazlawik and Wolgamott |
2021-05-03 | House | Author added Masin |
2021-04-27 | House | Author added Bernardy |
2021-04-22 | House | Author added Ecklund |
2021-04-19 | House | Author added Poston |
2021-04-16 | House | Author added Davnie |
2021-04-09 | House | Authors added Pierson, Backer |
2021-03-25 | House | Author added Heinrich |
2021-03-15 | House | Author added Xiong, J. |
2021-03-11 | House | Authors added Lee, Boe, Hamilton, Miller, Sandstede, Bahr and Urdahl |
2021-03-04 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Rules and Legislative Administration |
Same As/Similar To
SF1783 (Similar To) 2021-03-10 - Author added Westrom