MN HF1903 | 2011-2012 | 87th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 16 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-16 - Secretary of State Chapter 149 04/02/12
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 16 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-16 - Secretary of State Chapter 149 04/02/12
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Honor guard stipends preference modified.
Title
Honor guard stipends preference modified.
Sponsors
Rep. Dean Urdahl [R] | Rep. Bob Dettmer [R] | Rep. Bud Nornes [R] | Sen. Mike Parry [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-03-01 - House - Passage (Y: 128 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-16 | Secretary of State Chapter 149 04/02/12 | |
2012-04-02 | Governor's action Approval | |
2012-03-29 | House | Returned from Senate |
2012-03-29 | Senate | Third reading Passed vote: 63-0 |
2012-03-29 | Senate | Special Order |
2012-03-08 | Senate | Second reading |
2012-03-08 | Senate | Comm report: To pass |
2012-03-05 | Senate | Referred to State Government Innovation and Veterans |
2012-03-05 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
2012-03-05 | Senate | Received from House |
2012-03-01 | House | Bill was passed vote: 128-0 |
2012-03-01 | House | House rule 2.05, member excused from voting Crawford |
2012-03-01 | House | Third reading |
2012-02-29 | House | House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day |
2012-02-09 | House | Second reading |
2012-02-09 | House | Committee report, to pass |
2012-01-30 | House | Division action, to pass and return to State Government Finance |
2012-01-30 | House | Author added Nornes |
2012-01-26 | House | Author added Dettmer |
2012-01-24 | House | Referred by Chair to Veterans Services Division |
2012-01-24 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to State Government Finance |