MN HF1890 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on March 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-22 - Author added Jordan
Pending: House Legacy Funding Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-22 - Author added Jordan
Pending: House Legacy Funding Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Lower Phalen Creek Project cultural interpretive center funding provided, and money appropriated.
Title
Lower Phalen Creek Project cultural interpretive center funding provided, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
Rep. Jay Xiong [D] | Rep. John Thompson [D] | Rep. Hodan Hassan [D] | Rep. Aisha Gomez [D] |
Rep. Athena Hollins [D] | Rep. Samantha Vang [D] | Rep. Sydney Jordan [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-22 | House | Author added Jordan |
2021-03-17 | House | Author added Vang |
2021-03-04 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Legacy Finance |
Same As/Similar To
SF1944 (Similar To) 2021-05-10 - Author added Kunesh