MN HF1888 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-01 - Author added Cantrell
Pending: House Health and Human Services Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-01 - Author added Cantrell
Pending: House Health and Human Services Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Psychiatric residential treatment facilities and intensive treatment requirements in foster care modified, and money appropriated.
Title
Psychiatric residential treatment facilities and intensive treatment requirements in foster care modified, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
Sen. Kelly Morrison [D] | Rep. Tony Albright [R] | Rep. Jennifer Schultz [D] | Rep. Nels Pierson [R] |
Rep. Hunter Cantrell [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-01 | House | Author added Cantrell |
2019-03-15 | House | Referred by Chair to Health and Human Services Finance Division |
2019-03-14 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Ways and Means |
2019-02-28 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Health and Human Services Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF1835 (Similar To) 2019-02-27 - Referred to Human Services Reform Finance and Policy