MN HF186 | 2011-2012 | 87th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 9-4)
Status: Passed on May 24 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-24 - Secretary of State Chapter 54
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 9-4)
Status: Passed on May 24 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-24 - Secretary of State Chapter 54
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Driver's license expiration period extended while person is serving in active military service.
Title
Driver's license expiration period extended while person is serving in active military service.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-05-19 - House - Repassage, as amended by Conference committee (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-27 - House - Passage (Y: 123 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-27 - House - Passage (Y: 123 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-24 | Secretary of State Chapter 54 | |
2011-05-24 | Governor's action Approval | |
2011-05-24 | Governor approval | |
2011-05-21 | Presented to Governor | |
2011-05-20 | Senate | Third reading vote: 63-0 |
2011-05-20 | Senate | Senate adopted CC report and repassed bill |
2011-05-20 | Senate | Conference committee report |
2011-05-20 | Senate | House adopted HCC report and repassed bill |
2011-05-20 | House | Senate concurrence and repassage vote: 63-0 |
2011-05-19 | House | Bill was repassed as amended by Conference vote: 133-0 |
2011-05-19 | House | Third reading as amended by Conference |
2011-05-19 | House | House adopted conference committee report |
2011-05-19 | House | Conference committee report |
2011-05-14 | House | Senate conferees Daley, Chamberlain and Reinert |
2011-05-14 | House | Senate accedes, conference committee of 3 be appointed |
2011-05-13 | Senate | Senate conferees Daley; Chamberlain; Reinert |
2011-05-13 | Senate | Senate accedes, CC of 3 be appointed |
2011-05-13 | Senate | House conferees Urdahl; Dettmer; Koenen |
2011-05-13 | Senate | House not concur, conference committee of 3 requested |
2011-05-12 | House | House conferees Urdahl, Dettmer, Koenen |
2011-05-12 | House | House refuses to concur, conference committee of 3 requested |
2011-05-12 | House | Returned from Senate with amendment |
2011-05-10 | Senate | Calendar: Third reading Passed vote: 65-0 |
2011-05-04 | Senate | General Orders: To pass |
2011-05-02 | Senate | Second reading |
2011-05-02 | Senate | Comm report: Rule 45-amend, subst. General Orders SF395 |
2011-04-28 | Senate | Referred to Rules and Administration |
2011-04-28 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
2011-04-28 | Senate | Received from House |
2011-04-27 | House | Bill was passed as amended vote: 123-3 |
2011-04-27 | House | Third reading as amended |
2011-04-27 | House | Amended |
2011-04-14 | House | House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day |
2011-04-11 | House | Second reading |
2011-04-11 | House | Committee report, to pass |
2011-04-05 | House | Author added Greene |
2011-03-03 | House | Committee report, to pass as amended and re-refer to Transportation Policy and Finance |
2011-02-28 | House | Author added LeMieur |
2011-02-02 | House | Author added Atkins |
2011-01-27 | House | Author added Holberg |
2011-01-26 | House | Author added Ward |
2011-01-24 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Veterans Services Division |