MN HF1849 | 2023-2024 | 93rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-15 - Author changed Schultz (as chief author)
Pending: House Environment and Natural Resources Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-15 - Author changed Schultz (as chief author)
Pending: House Environment and Natural Resources Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Consumer choice of fuel provided, rulemaking authority modified, and Clean Car rules eliminated.
Title
Consumer choice of fuel provided, rulemaking authority modified, and Clean Car rules eliminated.
Sponsors
Rep. Isaac Schultz [R] | Rep. Kurt Daudt [R] | Rep. Brian Daniels [R] | Rep. Nolan West [R] |
Rep. Harry Niska [R] | Rep. Paul Novotny [R] | Rep. Krista Knudsen [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-15 | House | Author changed Schultz (as chief author) |
2023-02-27 | House | Author added Knudsen |
2023-02-16 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Environment and Natural Resources Finance and Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF1455 (Similar To) 2023-02-09 - Referred to Environment, Climate, and Legacy