MN HF1845 | 2023-2024 | 93rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-16 - Authors added Zeleznikar and Hemmingsen-Jaeger
Pending: House Human Services Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-16 - Authors added Zeleznikar and Hemmingsen-Jaeger
Pending: House Human Services Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Wellness in the Woods funding provided, and money appropriated.
Title
Wellness in the Woods funding provided, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-16 | House | Authors added Zeleznikar and Hemmingsen-Jaeger |
2023-03-08 | House | Author added Edelson |
2023-03-02 | House | Authors added Hassan and Richardson |
2023-02-27 | House | Authors added Anderson, P. H.; Davis; Curran |
2023-02-20 | House | Author added Knudsen |
2023-02-16 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Human Services Finance |
Same As/Similar To
SF1568 (Similar To) 2023-03-02 - Author added Abeler