MN HF1836 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on March 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-22 - Authors added Long and Huot
Pending: House Education Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-22 - Authors added Long and Huot
Pending: House Education Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Digital well-being education and training promoted for health, mental well-being, and learning of Minnesota students relating to digital media use; Minnesota-based organization collaborating with communities for digital well-being promotion funding provided; and money appropriated.
Title
Digital well-being education and training promoted for health, mental well-being, and learning of Minnesota students relating to digital media use; Minnesota-based organization collaborating with communities for digital well-being promotion funding provided; and money appropriated.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-22 | House | Authors added Long and Huot |
2021-03-17 | House | Author added Wazlawik |
2021-03-04 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Education Finance |
Same As/Similar To
SF1012 (Similar To) 2021-02-17 - Author added Duckworth