MN HF1763 | 2023-2024 | 93rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 15 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-16 - Author added Skraba
Pending: House Environment and Natural Resources Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-16 - Author added Skraba
Pending: House Environment and Natural Resources Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Definition of all-terrain vehicle modified.
Title
Definition of all-terrain vehicle modified.
Sponsors
Rep. Dave Lislegard [D] | Rep. John Burkel [R] | Rep. Isaac Schultz [R] | Rep. Erin Koegel [D] |
Rep. Ben Davis [R] | Rep. Jeff Brand [D] | Rep. Roger Skraba [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-16 | House | Author added Skraba |
2023-03-08 | House | Authors added Davis and Brand |
2023-03-06 | House | Author added Koegel |
2023-02-15 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Environment and Natural Resources Finance and Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF1713 (Similar To) 2023-02-20 - Author added Farnsworth